Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Tyler, Sarah Renee, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Motion To Modify |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Bill of Costs | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Motion | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Baardsen, Dawn, Arrington, Tamera S.) | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Burleson, Royal Anthony, Jr. Served 05/23/2018 Returned 05/29/2018 Tyler, Sarah Renee Served 05/22/2018 Returned 05/25/2018 | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify/Enforce-AG ONLY - (OCA) Reopen Motion to Modify/Enforce-AG ONLY - (OCA) Reopen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.