Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tenbrook, James Robert, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tenbrook, Nicole Virginia, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Qualified Medical Child Support Order | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Employers Order To Withhold Income | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Waiver of Citation | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.