Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lyons, Vincent H., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lyons, Lauren A., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation Lyons, Lauren A. Served 01/28/2009 Returned 02/19/2009 | |
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation Lyons, Lauren A. Unserved | |
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.