Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ellis, Martha, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ellis, Bradley S, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal For Want of Prosecution | |
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Silverstone, Mark J.) | |
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Docket Letter Mailed | |
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing By Agreement CANCELED Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Silverstone, Mark J.) By Agreement |
|
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Precept Ellis, Bradley S Unserved | |
December 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation Ellis, Bradley S Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.