Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Okeke, Alesia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Okeke, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Silverstone, Mark J.) | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit Mailed | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
December 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Docket Letter Mailed | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Silverstone, Mark J.) | |
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Silverstone, Mark J.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.