Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Price, Joseph Leslie, Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cumento, Mary Caroline, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Third Amended Petition | |
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Second Amended Petition | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | First Amended Petition | |
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petitioner's Original Petition (OCA) Vol./Book , Page Vol./Book , Page |
|
December 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation Cumento, Mary Caroline Served 02/03/2007 Response Received 07/19/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.