Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Mcdaniel, Rebecca Ruth, Johnson, Wayne Urel, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2006 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Motion To Modify |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge's Docket Entry | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order on Motion | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify/Enforce-AG ONLY - (OCA) Reopen Motion to Modify/Enforce-AG ONLY - (OCA) Reopen |
|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
July 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Administrative Writ of Withholding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.