Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones, Virginia M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Donald W, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Michael P. Jergins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2006 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jergins, Michael P.) | |
December 20, 2006 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Precept Jones, Donald W Served 12/12/2006 Response Due 01/08/2007 | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petitioner's Original Petition (OCA) Vol./Book , Page Vol./Book , Page |
|
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Precept | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation Jones, Donald W Served 12/12/2006 Response Due 01/08/2007 | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.