Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Melbin, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against The Office Of The Attorney General, Martinez, Jessica D, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Michael P. Jergins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2004 |
CategoryAll Other Family Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Exhibits Destroyed | |
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
June 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
April 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Enforce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jergins, Michael P.) | |
March 31, 2005 | Docket Event | Motion to Enforce (non OCA) | |
February 03, 2005 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Enforce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jergins, Michael P.) | |
January 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Enforce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jergins, Michael P.) | |
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event | Motion for Enforcement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.