Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Owens, Brandon D., Fuller, Kammica Woods, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2008 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeOrder On Motion To Modify |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Bill of Costs | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Motion | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge's Docket Entry | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Fuller, Kammica Woods Served 08/24/2018 Returned 09/05/2018 Owens, Brandon D. Served 08/29/2018 Returned 09/11/2018 | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify/Enforce-AG ONLY - (OCA) Reopen Motion to Modify/Enforce-AG ONLY - (OCA) Reopen |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.