Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Other (Ccld) case in the jurisdiction of Webb County, TX, . Webb County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2019 |
CategoryOther (Ccld) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWebb County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Filing RELEASE OF JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER DELONEY | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notes-Hearing Notes CASE CALLED. JUDGE HUGO MARTINEZ PRESIDING. COURT REPORTER BLANCA HILL. HEARING ON CALENDAR CALL. ATTORNEY RODOLFO MORALES PRESENT. PLAINTIFF/ DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. MOTION FOR DEFFAULT JUDGMENT GRANTED AND SIGNED. | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice-Miscellaneous COPY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER R. DELONEY/BLANCA NAUDIN | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment-Default Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE HUGO MARTINEZ ON 1/31/2020 | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER DELONEY. ORDER SENT TO COURT BY CLERK. | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion For Default Judgment MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER DELONEY | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Setting NOTICE OF SETTING FOR CALENDAR CALL ON 1/31/2020 AT 8:30 A.M SIGNED BY COURT COORDINATOR. *CONFIRMATION ATTACHED. | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notes-Hearing Notes CASE CALLED. HONORABLE JUDGE HUGO MARTINEZ PRESIDING. GINNY HENDERSON COURT REPORTER. NO ONE PRESENT. HEARING SET FOR CALENDAR CALL. CASE RESET FOR 01/31/2020. | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service RETURN OF SERVICE AS TO BLANCA NAUDIN. DATE OF SERVICE: 12/11/2019 | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter LETTER FROM LAW OFFICE OF DELONEY REQUEST RESET DATE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.