Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cabot Cook, Llc filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts 53rd District Court with EISERLOH, LAURIE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House53rd District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST CRT COST/FINE BILL OF COST FOR SEVERANCE Party: Plaintiff LEE, RAYMOND | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER INITIATING CASE (OCA) (Judicial Officer: EISERLOH, LAURIE) DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS RAYMOND LEE AND CABOT COOK, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANTS ROY DEAN STEPHENS, SR. AND HIDDEN PATH RV RESORT LIMITED AND ORDER OF SEVERANCE WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANTS ROY DEAN STEPHENS, JR. AND RDS GREEN DESIGN LLC | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE NOTICE OF IN-PERSON COURT PROCEEDING ON THE CENTRAL DOCKET Party: Plaintiff CABOT COOK, LLC; Plaintiff LEE, RAYMOND | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ROY DEAN STEPHENS, SR. AND HIDDEN PATH RV RESORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND MOTION FOR SEVERANCE WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANTS ROY DEAN STEPHENS, JR. AND RDS GREEN DESIGN LLC Party: Plaintiff CABOT COOK, LLC; Plaintiff LEE, RAYMOND | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE EXECUTED CITATION HIDDEN PATH RV RESORT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE EXECUTED CITATION ROY DEAN STEPHENS SR | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL PETITION Party: Plaintiff CABOT COOK, LLC; Plaintiff LEE, RAYMOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.