Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Mesquite Texas filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts with SOIFER, JAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2022 |
CategoryOther Tax |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL OR PARTIAL DISPOSITION ORDER (Judicial Officer: SOIFER, JAN) FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff CITY OF MESQUITE TEXAS; Plaintiff STATE OF TEXAS Party 2: Defendant MORALES, ARACELE; Defendant NEATCLEAN MAIDS LLC | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CVD:DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT Party: Plaintiff CITY OF MESQUITE TEXAS; Plaintiff STATE OF TEXAS | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE SECRETARY OF STATE CERTIFICATE NEATCLEAN MAIDS LLC | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE EXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE OF CITATION ON NEATCLEAN MAIDS LLC BY SERCRETARY OF STATE 2-15-2023 Party: Defendant NEATCLEAN MAIDS LLC | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PLEADING PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED PETITION Party: Plaintiff CITY OF MESQUITE TEXAS; Plaintiff STATE OF TEXAS | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE SERVICE REQUEST LETTER - SOS | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE EXECUTED CITATION- ARACELE MORALES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.