Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Reno Joshua Travis, against Padgett , Jacob Moore, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2020 |
CategorySeizure/Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: November 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CVD:DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) Event Code: 4613 | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE Event Code: 8216 | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENTER/SIGN ORDER MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Event Code: 5258 | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION JACOB MOORE PADGETT Event Code: 4893 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE CITATION JACOB MOORE PADGETT Event Code: 4899 | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Create New Case and Assess/Waive - Assessment Event Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | WAV:CITATION ISSUE Create New Case and Assess/Waive -- Waiver Event Event Code: 1102 Adjmt Amount: -8.00 | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | WAV:CITATION SERVICE CST3 Create New Case and Assess/Waive -- Waiver Event Event Code: 1228 Adjmt Amount: -80.00 | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | WAV:CIVIL COPY CERTIFIED FEES Create New Case and Assess/Waive -- Waiver Event Event Code: 1320 Adjmt Amount: -4.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.