Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Huerta , Mayra, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Archer Casey James, Faudoa Bertha Alicia, Morrow Christopher T., Ranco Robert Lucas, against Gattis Great Pizza Inc, represented by Deas John F., Watson Elizabeth Shirley, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2018LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 11, 2020ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR LETTER/EMAIL/CORR Event Code: 5414 | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURN MAIL OF NOTICE OF ORDER Event Code: 5554 | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED Event Code: 5601 | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE REACTIVATED (OCA) Event Code: 9898 | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CVD:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (OCA) Event Code: 4619 | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT,GATTI'S GREAT PIZZA, INC'S TRADITIO NAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF MAYRA HUER TA Event Code: 8233 | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANT'S TRADITIONAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff HUERTA, MAYRA | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE AND DESIGNATION OF LE AD COUNSEL Event Code: 5550 Party: Plaintiff HUERTA, MAYRA | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRADITIONAL MOTIO N FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5554 Party: Defendant GATTIS GREAT PIZZA INC | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT, GATTI'S GREAT PIZZA IC'S TRADITIONAL MOTION FOR S UMMARY JUDGMENT Event Code: 5269 Party: Defendant GATTIS GREAT PIZZA INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.