Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Escamilla David A., in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCitation To Surety |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION-TODDD THROCKMORTON(PRINCIPAL) Event Code: 4893 Party: Principal Defendant THROCKMORTON, TODD | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE CITATION-TODD THROCKMORTON(PRINCIPAL) Event Code: 4899 Party: Principal Defendant THROCKMORTON, TODD | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ISS: CITATION SURETY Form Number P45-1945 Issued by ARZOLA JESSICA (4745) ISS:CITATION SURETY Event Code: 4745 Party: Principal Defendant THROCKMORTON, TODD | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION SURETY | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ASM:GV GOVT CITATION TO SURETY Event Code: 623 Adjmt Amount: 255.00 Party: Principal Defendant THROCKMORTON, TODD | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION SERVICE CST5 Event Code: 830 Adjmt Amount: 75.00 Party: Principal Defendant THROCKMORTON, TODD | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Principal Defendant THROCKMORTON, TODD | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | !ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION JUDGMENT NISI (ORIGINAL PETITION) Event Code: 5080 Party: Plaintiff STATE OF TEXAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.