Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guerrero , Melerie, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Reed Nicholas Alton, against Jones , Kirk, represented by Jewett David Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
|
MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 01, 2019!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 17, 2019!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 17, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 13, 2018ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 22, 2019ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: June 19, 2019AMENDED/SUPPLEMENTED ANSWER
Date: March 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) Event Code: 4615 | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF NONSUIT Event Code: 8223 Party: Plaintiff GUERRERO, MELERIE | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED/PROPOSED ORDER Event Code: 5422 | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING Event Code: 5554 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF?S SECOND NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVITS Event Code: 5554 Party: Plaintiff GUERRERO, MELERIE | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF?S FIRST NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVITS Event Code: 5554 Party: Plaintiff GUERRERO, MELERIE | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff GUERRERO, MELERIE | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MTN:CONTINUANCE DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Event Code: 5255 Party: Defendant JONES, KIRK | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE-DOMINIC RINCON Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff GUERRERO, MELERIE | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATE ANDREW O' DEAN Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff GUERRERO, MELERIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.