Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tatro , Cassie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Holtzman Jack Harold, against Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Thompson William Cole, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Vehicle (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 11, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 12, 2018ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: February 15, 2019MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.