Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Investment Retrievers Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tucker Carl L., against Reyes , Alejandra K, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RETAIN/REINSTATE | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | EXPEDITE ORIG PET RULE 169 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.