Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Travis County, Austin Independent School District, Austin Community College, City Of Austin, Travis County Healthcare District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Beck Jack Elliott, against Burkepile , Linda Munoz, Munoz , Juanita A, Munoz , James, Munoz , Moses, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2015 |
CategoryTravis County Tax (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 10, 2015ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 08, 2016AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: February 16, 2016ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 16, 2016ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: April 13, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | !UNEXE RETURN OF SERVICE | |
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CITATION SIGNED & SEALED | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CIT SECT OF ST SIGNED & SEALED | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.