Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Dallas, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case represented by Gordon Norman J., against Sabine River Authority Of Texas, represented by De La Fuente Jose E., in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts with Stephen Yelenosky presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2015 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
|
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 09, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: January 30, 2015RESPONSE
Date: April 17, 2015AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: May 06, 2015RESPONSE
Date: May 13, 2015RESPONSE
Date: May 14, 2015FINAL ORDER
Date: May 21, 2015NTC:NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 15, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: June 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:MANDATE MANDATE W/BILL OF COST FROM THE THIRD COURT OF APPEALS Event Code: 8218 | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:MANDATE | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND JUDGMENT Event Code: 8225 | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS RECORD TRANSMITTAL TAMES RECORDS SUBMISSION REPORT CLERK'S RECORD SUBMITTED TO THE 3RD COURT OF APPEALS Event Code: 5606 | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE LETTER FROM COURTLAND CROCKER Event Code: 5415 | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CLERKS RECORD TRANSMITTAL | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE LETTER Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff CITY OF DALLAS TEXAS | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.