Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hensley , Tommy, filed a(n) Admin Appeals - Administrative case represented by Farrow-Gillespie Liza, against Texas Health And Human Services Commission, represented by Holsinger Kara Denise, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2015 |
CategoryAdministrative Appeal (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAdmin Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | DWOP BLANKET ORDER | |
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
March 13, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.