Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ovations Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gunkel William Jordan, against Ledesma , Alfred Dominguez, Onemain Financial, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryHome Equity Loan Foreclosure (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: January 28, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: January 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.