Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Travis Green Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Brown Kim D., against Finley , Karen Elaine, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryHome Owner Assoc Disputes (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.