Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eastman Chemical Compnay, Eastman Tc Inc, Virtus Capital Lp C O Friedlander And Gorris Pa, filed a(n) Other Civil (Gen Lit ) case represented by Ledbetter V. Elizabeth, against Eastman Chemical Compnay, Eastman Tc Inc, represented by Ledbetter V. Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryOther Civil (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
|
SUBPOENA SIGNED & SEALED
Date: January 14, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: June 03, 2016SUBPOENA SIGNED & SEALED
Date: December 31, 2014SUBPOENA SIGNED & SEALED
Date: April 22, 2015ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2014SUBPOENA SIGNED & SEALED
Date: April 21, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: June 14, 2016DWOP BLANKET ORDER
Date: August 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | DWOP BLANKET ORDER | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA SIGNED & SEALED | |
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA SIGNED & SEALED | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.