Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Opsmd Inc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Meisel Seth Emmanuel, Rowe J. David, against Hackney , Greg, Medigain Llc, Prudential Investments Management Inc, represented by Gardner Michael Scott, Lowenstein Jeffrey Scott, Webster David Gilbert, York Andrew Kohl, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryFraud (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: January 20, 2015RESPONSE
Date: March 09, 2015RESPONSE
Date: February 27, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: March 25, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 25, 2015!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 21, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: September 11, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 12, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: November 18, 2015ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2017ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2014ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 09, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: February 09, 2015MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS
Date: April 15, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: April 28, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: April 29, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: September 21, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: September 22, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 29, 2015LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: December 22, 2015ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: December 22, 2015ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: February 04, 2016MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
December 22, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.