Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rechner Mark August, Sellers Thomas Mcarthur, against Murphy , Justin, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: May 14, 2015ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: May 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event | EXPEDITE ORIG PET RULE 169 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.