Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Brackett Thomas Linn, Christoffel Lauren Emily, Gladney Danya Fuller, Kirk Lelan Conrad, against O Sullivan , Michael Edward, O Sullivan , Sean, represented by Russell Bill W., in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2014 |
CategoryOther Property (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: November 26, 2014ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 12, 2015AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: June 23, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 18, 2015RESPONSE
Date: February 18, 2016ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: February 18, 2016MOTION TO RETAIN/REINSTATE
Date: April 19, 2017ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 29, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: November 09, 2017MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: April 09, 2018ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: June 18, 2018MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:RETAIN | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RETAIN/REINSTATE | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.