Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velocity Credit Union, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Duewall Craig Alan, against Morales , Jeffrey K, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategorySequestration (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeLiens |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2011ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 31, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:ISSUE/SERVICE | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | OTHER FILING | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | ORD:ISSUE/SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.