Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Read , Marcia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Haney Susan J., against Cofty , Patricia M, Cunnigham , Jack W, Fowler Law Firm Pc, represented by Otto Jeff D., in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2011RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING
Date: February 22, 2012ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING
Date: January 27, 2012MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER
Date: May 18, 2012RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: January 31, 2013MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: November 19, 2013MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: October 09, 2014ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: October 09, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
February 15, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:SCHEDULE/DOCKET CONTROL | |
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:SCHEDULE/DOCKET CONTROL | |
June 29, 2012 | Docket Event | EXE SERVICE OF SUBPOENA | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | EXE SERVICE OF SUBPOENA | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.