Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Batrice , Rania H, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Batrice Paul Alexander, against Federal National Mortgage Association, Pnc Bank National Association, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 29, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC OF REMOVAL | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.