Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Premier Capital Llc, filed a(n) Injunction/Protective Ord Civi (Gen Lit ) case represented by Milner Harvey Clinton, against Hunter Kelsey Ii Lp, Preisler , Robert Andrew Bobby, represented by Andrews Daniel W., in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryInjunction/Protective Ord Civi (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
|
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2011ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING
Date: January 30, 2012ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 24, 2012MTN:SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2012MTN:CONTINUANCE
Date: March 07, 2013OBJECTIONS
Date: March 11, 2013MTN:LEAVE
Date: March 11, 2013MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT
Date: June 18, 2013ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: July 09, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | OBJECTIONS | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:LEAVE | |
March 07, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:CONTINUANCE | |
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | MTN:SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
September 12, 2012 | Docket Event | NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL | |
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
February 07, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.