Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gj Audio Video Design Center Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Burnett Michael Leonard Ray, against Green Synergy Projects Inc, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2009 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2009LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 02, 2010MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER
Date: July 16, 2010ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 20, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD:ISSUE/SERVICE | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | UNEXECUTED RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.