Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wheeler Coatings Asphalt Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stipanovic Paul, against Weynand , Mike, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2009 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 23, 2009LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 23, 2010ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: December 12, 2011MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER
Date: June 01, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: June 01, 2010ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | EXE SERVICE OF WRIT/ORD | |
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | FORM | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | MTN:ENTER JUDGMENT/SIGN ORDER | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.