Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allen , Barbara, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Brien Kerry Vincent, against Moster And Wynne Pc, represented by Corbett James Martin, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 25, 2008 |
CategoryDebt/Contract (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: September 22, 2009MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 13, 2010MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: December 30, 2009ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION
Date: January 25, 2010MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT
Date: April 12, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: November 25, 2008ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 06, 2009RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: February 25, 2009RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: September 22, 2009RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: September 29, 2009MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS
Date: October 11, 2009ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: October 15, 2009RESPONSE
Date: October 13, 2009MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: December 14, 2009LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: October 16, 2009RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING
Date: January 13, 2010MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS
Date: January 14, 2010RESPONSE
Date: January 19, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 20, 2010AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: January 22, 2010AMENDED/SUPPLEMENTED ANSWER
Date: January 22, 2010RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: February 09, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: February 09, 2010ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: April 19, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT | |
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event | RULE 203.2 CERTIFICATE | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | ORD:DENIED MOTION/APPLICATION | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.