Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Valdez , Kristen, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ainsworth Price, against Rodriguez , Maria D, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Other (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 23, 2006ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: December 28, 2007ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2005ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 17, 2006MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS
Date: March 16, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | ORD:APPOINTMENT | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event | ORD:APPOINTMENT | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | ORD:APPOINTMENT | |
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event | MTN:APPOINT/APPOINTMENT | |
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event | RULE 203.2 CERTIFICATE | |
March 16, 2007 | Docket Event | MTN:COMPEL/SANCTIONS | |
February 17, 2006 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.