Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ingram , Steven, Steven J Ingram Pro Se, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Glasgow , Chad, Management , Hertz Claim, represented by Salinas Joanna Lippman, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2005 |
CategoryNegligence (Gen Lit ) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING
Date: June 19, 2006ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 06, 2005ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 10, 2006LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: February 28, 2006RESPONSE TO MOTION/PLEADING
Date: March 06, 2006ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: March 17, 2006MTN:SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2006LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 21, 2006MTN:CONTINUANCE
Date: May 09, 2006MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 15, 2006ORD:SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2006MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: May 25, 2006MTN:LEAVE
Date: May 26, 2006AMENDED/SUPPLEMENTED ANSWER
Date: June 07, 2006MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 15, 2006MTN:MODIFY, REDUCE, ENFO,CONTE
Date: June 16, 2006MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 20, 2006ORD:MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: June 20, 2006REQUEST FINDINGS FACT CNCL LAW
Date: January 02, 2007ORD:JUDGMENT
Date: June 20, 2006REQUEST FINDINGS FACT CNCL LAW
Date: April 02, 2007REQUEST FINDINGS FACT CNCL LAW
Date: March 20, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FINDINGS FACT CNCL LAW | |
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FINDINGS FACT CNCL LAW | |
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event | REQUEST FINDINGS FACT CNCL LAW | |
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event | MTN:NEW TRIAL/REHEARING | |
September 28, 2006 | Docket Event | MTN:NEW TRIAL/REHEARING | |
July 20, 2006 | Docket Event | MTN:NEW TRIAL/REHEARING | |
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD:MOTION IN LIMINE | |
June 20, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD:JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.