Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alba, Rosa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alba, Epimenio, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Mark Boessenecker presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2009 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time122 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Alba, R. vs. Alba, E. ; Judge: J21198 Boessenecker Mark Judge: Boessenecker, Mark |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 30 2009 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Disclosure 929320-Disclosure Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DISCLOSURE [929320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912320-Proof of Service (Petition) Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE (PETITION) [912320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Add'l Description: Failure to File POS Filed/Issued By: 924110 - Court NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : FAILURE TO FILE POS Filed By COURT [924110] |
|
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Petition 912110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PETITION [912110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.