Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Branscomb , Richard, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Doherty , Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryParent Child Relationship Trns (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: February 17, 2016!ORI ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 19, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: June 06, 2017!MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE
Date: December 11, 2015MTN:TRANSFER
Date: December 11, 2015!MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE
Date: December 16, 2015MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 11, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 11, 2016!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 11, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 27, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 14, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 01, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: September 20, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 01, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: October 03, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: October 27, 2016!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: December 01, 2016!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: December 09, 2016LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: December 09, 2016!MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE
Date: January 12, 2017!MOTION TO RETAIN/REINSTATE
Date: February 07, 2017LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: February 13, 2017!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 16, 2017!MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 20, 2017LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 04, 2017!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: April 06, 2017!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: September 08, 2017!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: December 20, 2017!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: December 21, 2017!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 19, 2018!LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: November 13, 2018LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 12, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: July 24, 2019LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: September 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | !LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | !LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | !LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | !LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | !LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | ORD:RETAIN | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | !NTC:ATTORNEY/COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.