Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rufino , Ricardo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Arenas , Leticia, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | !EXE SERVICE | |
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | !ORD:DECREE DIVORCE W/CHILD | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | !ORI ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | !ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.