Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Teller , Mary Ellen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Teller , Kenneth Williams, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
RULE 11 AGREEMENT
Date: June 04, 2012ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: February 13, 2013JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: February 14, 2013ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 30, 2011LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: March 02, 2012LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: April 23, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
February 14, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE | |
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | RULE 11 AGREEMENT | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CITATION OR SERVICE | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.