Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Reed , Stephanie Holt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Alexander Meghan Elizabeth, Russell William Henry, against Wishnew , David Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
AGREEMENT
Date: March 19, 2012JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: October 12, 2012ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2011ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 03, 2012ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: October 12, 2012AGREEMENT
Date: March 27, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
October 12, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE | |
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT | |
March 19, 2012 | Docket Event | AGREEMENT | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | COUNTERCLAIM/CROSS | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.