Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bray , Matt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bray , Shery, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2011 |
CategoryDivorce W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 31, 2012ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: February 24, 2012MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: August 02, 2013JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: February 13, 2014ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 28, 2011AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: December 30, 2011MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: April 15, 2013LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 02, 2013LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: May 14, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ORD:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | !ORD:DECREE DIVORCE | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | MTN:TEMPORARY ORDERS | |
May 14, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | COUNTERCLAIM/CROSS | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
April 26, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.