Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rayburn , Brittany Gail, Spruiell , Karlen Brant, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case against Spruiell , Harlan Laron, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2011 |
CategoryChange Of Name (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeName Change |
ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: August 30, 2012ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 27, 2011ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING
Date: January 30, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | NTC:HEARING/SETTING | |
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER & ADDITIONAL PLEADING | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ISS:CITATION | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT INABILITY PAY COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.