Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Conn , Jessica Meredith Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Colin , Devon Shea, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2009 |
CategoryAppl For Protective Order (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
!MTN:MODIFY,REDUCE,ENFOR,CONTE
Date: May 19, 2015ORD:EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD
Date: January 05, 2010ORD:EMPLOYERS ORDER WITHHOLD
Date: November 30, 2010ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: November 30, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: July 23, 2010ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 13, 2010ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 04, 2010ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 22, 2009!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: June 03, 2015!ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: May 20, 2015!AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: January 08, 2016!AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: January 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event | !ORD:MODIFY,CONTEMPT,ENFORCE | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | !AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | !AMENDED PETITION/SUPPLEMENTAL | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | !OTH:OTHER FILING | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | !NTC:OTHER NOTICE | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | !ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | !EXE SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.