Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hughes , Margaret Rose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hughes , Patrick Donald, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce Waiver W/Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: December 22, 2009ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: January 08, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: October 08, 2010LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 24, 2011LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: August 29, 2011LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: January 27, 2012MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: August 02, 2012ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: October 16, 2013JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED
Date: October 18, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NOTICE MAILED | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
October 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE W/CHILD | |
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | MTN:SUB & OR WITHDRAW COUNSEL | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER/EMAIL/CORR | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ORIG ANSWER/SPECIAL APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.