Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Elmalik , Nagi Hassam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mattingly Lee P., against Van Upp , Arden Dee Rich Ard, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDivorce W/O Child (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: January 06, 2006MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: March 29, 2006MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: December 30, 2005ORD:OTHER ORDER
Date: March 29, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION | |
March 29, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD:DECREE DIVORCE | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ORD:OTHER ORDER | |
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event | MTN:OTHER MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.