Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Edwards , Martha, Edwards , Rudy Montel, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Williamson , Rudolph Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryAg Paternity (Family Law) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
LETTER/EMAIL/CORR
Date: February 06, 2006ORD:RECESS/RESET ORDER
Date: February 22, 2006ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: February 22, 2006AG:MTN REVOKE
Date: November 27, 2006ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: April 19, 2006ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: November 30, 2006MTN:CONTEMPT
Date: December 11, 2006ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: May 03, 2007ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISSAL/NONSUIT
Date: January 10, 2007MTN:OTHER MOTION
Date: January 19, 2007MTN:DISMISS/NONSUIT
Date: January 09, 2007AG:MTN MODIFY
Date: May 10, 2012ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: March 29, 2012AG:MTN REVOKE
Date: June 15, 2009ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: August 23, 2010ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: November 15, 2011ORD:AG/IVD ORDER
Date: February 19, 2010ORD:NTC/ORD DISMISS NONSUIT AG
Date: May 04, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:MODIFY,CONTMPT,ENFORCE AG | |
September 18, 2012 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RECEIPT | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:RECESS/RESET ORD AG | |
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | AG:MTN MODIFY | |
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event | NTC:HEARING/SETTING | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | ORD:AG/IVD ORDER | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | ORD:AG/IVD ORDER | |
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event | ORD:ISSUE/SERVICE AG | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | EXECUTED WARRANT/CAPIAS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.