Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez , Abygale, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jasso Rolando M., against Austin Independent School District, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORIGINAL PETITION/APPLICATION
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MARTINEZ JONES, AURORA) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CVD:DISMISSAL/NONSUIT (OCA) | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO DISMISS Party: Plaintiff HERNANDEZ, ABYGALE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - FETCH PACKAGE | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE RULE 203 CERTIFICATION OF COURT COSTS DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - ONCOR | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING RULE 11 AGREEMENT Party: Defendant AUSTIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF TESTIFYING EXPERT WITNESSES | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS Party: Defendant AUSTIN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER (Judicial Officer: MARTINEZ JONES, AURORA) AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF ABYGALE HERNANDEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.