Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Walton , Jaemi, Walton , Nathan, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Walton Adam Torrance, against Springdale Station Llc, in the jurisdiction of Travis County, TX, . Travis County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryTitle To Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTravis County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER/WAIVER DEFENDANT SPRINGDALE STATION, LLC?S ORIGINAL ANSWER Event Code: 5150 Party: Defendant SPRINGDALE STATION LLC | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | EXECUTED SERVICE CITATION-SPRINGDALE STATTION LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED A GENT JENNIFER KHABELE Event Code: 4893 Party: Defendant SPRINGDALE STATION LLC | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION ISSUE Event Code: 702 Adjmt Amount: 8.00 Party: Plaintiff WALTON, NATHAN | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:CITATION SERVICE CST5 Event Code: 830 Adjmt Amount: 80.00 Party: Plaintiff WALTON, NATHAN | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER/NOTICE REQUEST FOR CITATION Event Code: 5415 Party: Plaintiff WALTON, NATHAN | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ASM:GN CIVIL PETITION Event Code: 600 Adjmt Amount: 307.00 Party: Plaintiff WALTON, NATHAN | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NEW:ORIGINAL PETITION/APPL (OCA) Event Code: 4500 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPEDITE ORIG PET RULE 169 EXPEDITED PETITION PURSUANT TO TEXAS RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 169 Event Code: 5049 Party: Plaintiff WALTON, NATHAN | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | EXPEDITE ORIG PET RULE 169 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.